Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/15/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/15/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/15/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/07/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/07/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/07/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/08/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/08/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/27/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/29/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/19/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/02/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/02/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/26/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 12/18/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/18/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/05/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/06/2006