Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/26/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/27/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/27/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/18/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/24/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/11/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/13/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/13/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2006