Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/27/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/27/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/01/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/01/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/20/2006