Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/27/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 04/27/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/17/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/17/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/25/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/16/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/16/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/16/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/22/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/22/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/22/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/26/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/26/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/26/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/13/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/13/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/13/2006