Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/02/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/03/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/03/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/11/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/16/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/16/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/19/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/22/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/06/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/06/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/07/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/20/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/21/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/14/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew