There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business Paperwork Amnesty Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 44 of the United States Code, to provide for the suspension of fines under certain circumstances for first-time paperwork violations by small business concerns.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/27/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/27/2006Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/27/2006Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/27/2006Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/27/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/12/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/29/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/29/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/29/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/29/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/18/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/14/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/14/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/14/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/14/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/19/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/19/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/19/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/20/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/20/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/26/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/29/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform04/27/2006 Referred to
House Small Business04/27/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5242. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/27/2006)

Small Business Paperwork Amnesty Act of 2006 - Amends the Paperwork Reduction Act to direct agency heads not to impose civil fines for first-time paperwork violations by small business concerns unless there is potential for serious harm to the public interest, the detection of criminal activity would be impaired, the violation is not corrected within six months, the violation is a violation of internal revenue law or a law concerning the assessment or collection of any tax, debt, revenue, or receipt, or the violation presents a danger to the public health or safety. Permits an agency to determine that a fine should not be imposed for a violation that presents a danger to public health or safety if the violation is corrected within 24 hours after receipt by the small business owner of notification of the violation in writing.

Makes this Act inapplicable to any violation by a small business of a requirement regarding the collection of information by an agency if the small business previously violated any requirement concerning the collection of information by that agency.