Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/10/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/10/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/10/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/10/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/10/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/10/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/10/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/10/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/10/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/10/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/10/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/10/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/10/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/10/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/10/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/10/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/10/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/10/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/10/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/10/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/10/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/10/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/19/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/19/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/19/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/25/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/25/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/16/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/16/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/16/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/16/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/16/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/16/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/16/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/29/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/29/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/19/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/19/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/19/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/06/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/14/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/20/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/20/2006