Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/27/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/27/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/03/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/16/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/12/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/12/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/12/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/20/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/12/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/12/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/25/2006