Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/27/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/03/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/08/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/22/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/24/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/07/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/07/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/13/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/14/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/26/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/28/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/10/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/10/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/17/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/17/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/19/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/24/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/24/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/24/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/25/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/25/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 07/26/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/28/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/07/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/07/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/07/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/07/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/07/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/12/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/12/2006