Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/08/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/08/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/08/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/09/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/09/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/09/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/09/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/09/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/09/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/09/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 02/09/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/09/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/10/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/10/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/10/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/10/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/10/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 02/15/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/15/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/15/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/01/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/08/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/14/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/14/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/14/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/17/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/06/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/12/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/12/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/13/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/13/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/13/2005

Show cosponsors who withdrew