Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/01/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/02/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/03/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/09/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/11/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/11/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/11/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/11/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/11/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/11/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/17/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2006