There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Refinery Permit Process Schedule Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Refinery Permit Process Schedule Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To set schedules for the consideration of permits for refineries.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/07/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 238 - 179 (Roll no. 232).(text: CR H3467-3468)
05/03/2006Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 237 - 188 (Roll no. 116).
05/02/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/13/2006SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
06/08/2006SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/07/2006-6:59pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 238 - 179 (Roll no. 232). (text: CR H3467-3468)
06/07/2006-6:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/07/2006-6:52pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 195 - 223 (Roll no. 231). (consideration: CR H3476-3478; text: CR H3477)
06/07/2006-6:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Boucher motion to recommit with instructions. The motion seeks to strike all after the enacting clause and insert a section titled "Strategic Refinery Reserve", and a section titled "Refinery Closing Reports."
06/07/2006-6:19pmHouseMr. Boucher moved to recommit with instructions to Energy and Commerce.
06/07/2006-6:19pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H3478)
06/07/2006-5:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5254.
06/07/2006-5:10pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 5254 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
06/07/2006-5:10pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 842. (consideration: CR H3467-3479)
06/07/2006-4:54pmHouseRule H. Res. 842 passed House.
05/26/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/25/2006-8:40pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 842 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5254 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
05/03/2006-3:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/03/2006-3:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 237 - 188 (Roll no. 116).
05/03/2006-2:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2031-2032)
05/03/2006-12:45pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/03/2006-12:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5254.
05/03/2006-12:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1999-2007; text of measure as introduced: CR H1999-2000)
05/03/2006-12:01pmHouseMr. Barton (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/02/2006HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/02/2006HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/02/2006HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/02/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/02/2006HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (24)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/02/2006 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality05/02/2006 Referred to
House Armed Services05/02/2006 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness05/26/2006 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/08/2006 Referred to
07/13/2006 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5254. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/07/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Refinery Permit Process Schedule Act - Authorizes the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), upon the request of a state governor, to provide financial assistance to hire additional personnel to assist the state with expertise in fields relevant to consideration of federal refinery authorizations.

Requires a federal agency responsible for refinery authorization to provide, upon the request of a state governor, technical, legal, or other nonfinancial assistance to facilitate state consideration of such authorizations.

Directs the President to appoint a federal coordinator to facilitate such authorizations.

Requires the coordinator, upon the request of an applicant seeking a federal refinery authorization, to establish a memorandum of agreement, executed by relevant federal and state agencies, setting forth the most expeditious coordinated schedule possible for completion of all such authorizations.

Grants the U.S. District Court for the district in which the proposed refinery is located exclusive jurisdiction over any civil action for the review of the failure of an agency or official to act on a federal refinery authorization in accordance with the schedule established pursuant to the memorandum of agreement. Requires expedited review of the civil action.

Instructs the President to designate at least three closed military installations as potentially suitable for the construction of a refinery. Requires that at least one such site be designated as potentially suitable for construction of a refinery to refine biomass in order to produce biofuel.

Requires the redevelopment authority, in preparing or revising the redevelopment plan for each such installation, to consider the feasibility and practicability of siting a refinery on it.

Amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to repeal its requirements for refinery revitalization.