Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/09/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/17/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/18/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/23/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/25/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/25/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/25/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/25/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/20/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/07/2006