Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/09/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/17/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/23/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/23/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/23/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/23/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/23/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/23/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/25/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/25/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/25/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/06/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/07/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/21/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/22/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/27/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/29/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/10/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/17/2006