Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/04/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/11/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/19/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/22/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/25/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/07/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/29/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew