Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/18/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/23/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/12/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/19/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/21/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/10/2006