Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/10/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/10/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/10/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/10/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/10/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/10/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/10/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/10/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/11/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/11/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/11/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/17/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/22/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/22/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/25/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/14/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/26/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/26/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/11/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/12/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/25/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/06/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/19/2006