Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/04/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/09/2006
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/09/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/09/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/11/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/16/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/08/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/08/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/08/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/08/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/08/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/08/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/08/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/08/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/08/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/08/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/08/2006