Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/04/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/12/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/13/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/13/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/14/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/19/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/19/2006