Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/04/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/12/2005