Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/18/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/18/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/18/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/18/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/09/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/09/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/16/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/16/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/29/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/29/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/13/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/13/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/14/2006