Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/09/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/09/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/10/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/11/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/16/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/16/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/16/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/16/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/16/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/16/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/16/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/16/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/18/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/19/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/22/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/25/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/09/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/09/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/09/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/12/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/12/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/12/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/12/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/12/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/12/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/15/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/15/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/15/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/15/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/19/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/19/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/29/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/29/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/29/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/13/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/13/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/20/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/27/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/27/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/29/2006