Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/09/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/10/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/10/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/11/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/11/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/11/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/11/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/11/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/11/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/23/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/23/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/24/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/06/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/19/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/20/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/20/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/20/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/20/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/26/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/27/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/10/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/20/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/24/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/24/2006