Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/10/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/10/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/10/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/15/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/01/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/10/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/19/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2006