Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/09/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/11/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/16/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/16/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/16/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/16/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/16/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/16/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/16/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/16/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/17/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/22/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/22/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/22/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/22/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/24/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/22/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/13/2006