Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/11/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/11/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/11/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/12/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/15/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/25/2006