Committees: H.R.5337 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/10/2006 Referred to
06/22/2006 Reported by House Report 109-523,Part 1
06/14/2006 Markup by
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology05/16/2006 Referred to
05/17/2006 Discharged from
05/17/2006 Hearings by
House Energy and Commerce05/10/2006 Referred to
07/17/2006 Reported by House Report 109-523,Part 2
07/12/2006 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection06/05/2006 Referred to
07/11/2006 Hearings by
House International Relations05/10/2006 Referred to
07/17/2006 Discharged from