Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/10/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/10/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 02/10/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/10/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/08/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/15/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/26/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/14/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/22/2005