Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/18/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/21/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/27/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/27/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/20/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/25/2006