Text: H.R.5347 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (11/13/2006)


109th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 5347

IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
September 27, 2006

Received

November 13, 2006

Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs


AN ACT

To reauthorize the HOPE VI program for revitalization of public housing projects.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “HOPE VI Reauthorization Act of 2006”.

SEC. 2. Extension of program.

Section 24 of the United States Housing Act of 1937 (42 U.S.C. 1437v) is amended—

(1) in paragraph (1) of subsection (m), by striking the matter that follows “section” and inserting the following: “such sums as may be necessary for fiscal year 2007.”; and

(2) in subsection (o), by striking “September 30, 2006” and inserting “September 30, 2007”.

Passed the House of Representatives September 27, 2006.

Attest: karen l. haas,   
Clerk.