Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/10/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/17/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/17/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/18/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/18/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/25/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/25/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/06/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/06/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/16/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/16/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/22/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/12/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/12/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/25/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/27/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/06/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/13/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/13/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/21/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/28/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/05/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/05/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/05/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/05/2006