Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/11/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/11/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 05/11/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/11/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/17/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/17/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/17/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/17/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/17/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/17/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/25/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/25/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 06/16/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/16/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/16/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/22/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/22/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/20/2006