There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

LISTEN Act
Lawful Intelligence and Surveillance of Terrorists in an Emergency by NSA Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reiterate that the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 and title 18, United States Code, are the exclusive means by which domestic electronic surveillance may be conducted, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/11/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/11/2006Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2006Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2006Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/11/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/18/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/18/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/18/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/18/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/18/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/18/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/18/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/18/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/19/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/19/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/19/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/23/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/23/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/23/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/25/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/16/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/22/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/22/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/22/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/28/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/19/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/20/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/26/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/27/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/28/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/11/2006 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)05/11/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5371.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5371. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/11/2006)

Lawful Intelligence and Surveillance of Terrorists in an Emergency by NSA Act or LISTEN Act - States that specified provisions of federal criminal law concerning wire and electronic communications and their interception and the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 (FISA) shall be the exclusive means by which domestic electronic surveillance may be conducted. Directs the President to ensure that: (1) all electronic surveillance of persons in the United States is conducted within those exclusive means; and (2) the procedures for applying for an order for electronic surveillance under FISA continue to be adequate for the timely and efficient electronic surveillance of appropriate targets.

Requires: (1) the President to report to the congressional intelligence and judiciary committees upon a determination that such procedures are inadequate; and (2) the report to contain findings and recommendations with respect to emergency or routine applications for such orders.

Authorizes appropriations to the National Security Agency (NSA) and the Department of Justice (DOJ) for activities of the Office of Intelligence Policy and Review to ensure the timely and efficient processing of applications to the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court.