Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/11/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/11/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/15/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/15/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/15/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/15/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/15/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/19/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/19/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/19/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/19/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/25/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/25/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/25/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/15/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/21/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/21/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/21/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/21/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/22/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/22/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/26/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/26/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/29/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/29/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/29/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/29/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/29/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/20/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/28/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/06/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/07/2006