Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/11/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/11/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/17/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/18/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/12/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/13/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/17/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/26/2006