Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
11/14/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.(text: CR 11/16/2006 S11087-11095)
07/20/2006 Committee on Appropriations. Reported by Senator Hutchison with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 109-286.
05/19/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 395 - 0 (Roll no. 176).
05/16/2006 Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 109-464, Part II.
05/15/2006 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 109-464, by Mr. Walsh.
05/15/2006 Introduced in House