Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/16/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/16/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/17/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/23/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/23/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/06/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/08/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/09/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/14/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/13/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/18/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/25/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/05/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/05/2006