There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cancer Survivorship Research and Quality of Life Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the expansion and coordination of activities of the National Institutes of Health and the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention with respect to research and programs on cancer survivorship, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/16/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/05/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/16/2006Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/16/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/16/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/19/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/19/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/19/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/19/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/19/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/24/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/24/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/24/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/24/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/16/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/16/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/29/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/10/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/10/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/11/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/13/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/19/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/19/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/19/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/12/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/12/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/19/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/14/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/14/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/14/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/16/2006 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/05/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5390.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5390. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/16/2006)

Cancer Survivorship Research and Quality of Life Act of 2006 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Director of the National Cancer Institute (NCI)) to establish and support demonstration, education, and other programs for cancer survivorship.

Requires the Director of the National Institutes of Health (NIH) to: (1) expand and coordinate NIH cancer survivorship research activities; (2) establish a Division of Cancer Survivorship within NCI; and (3) provide for the expansion of cancer survivorship research activities at NCI-designated cancer centers.

Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services, acting through the Director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC), to: (1) expand the National Comprehensive Cancer Control Program; (2) study the unique health challenges associated with cancer survivorship; and (3) carry out projects and interventions to improve the long-term health status of cancer survivors.

Requires the Secretary to: (1) establish programs that demonstrate how to prevent and control cancer and improve access to quality cancer care among racial and ethnic minorities and medically underserved populations with disproportionate incidence of, or death from, cancer; (2) promote cancer education, prevention, and early detection of cancer; (3) award grants for cancer control and prevention; and (4) establish the National Commission on Cancer Survivorship.

Requires the Secretary, acting through the Directors of CDC and NCI, to make grants to monitor and evaluate the quality of cancer care, develop information concerning the quality of care, and monitor cancer survivorship.