Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/17/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/17/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/22/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/22/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/24/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/19/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/19/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/19/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/19/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/2006