Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/14/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/14/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/14/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/14/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/14/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/19/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/22/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 06/27/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/28/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 11/13/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/13/2006