Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/03/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/07/2005