Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/19/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 05/19/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/24/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/24/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/06/2006