Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/19/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/20/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/17/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/17/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/17/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/17/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/17/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/19/2006