Refine your search

Showing 12 of 12 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/04/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-295.
10/04/2006 Signed by President.
10/03/2006 Presented to President.
09/29/2006 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S10618-10632)
09/29/2006 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 412 - 6 (Roll no. 509).
09/28/2006 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 109-699 filed.(text of conference report: CR H7784-7848)
09/25/2006 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
07/13/2006 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Gregg; Cochran; Stevens; Specter; Domenici; Shelby; Craig; Bennett; Allard; Byrd; Inouye; Leahy; Mikulski; Kohl; Murray; Reid; Feinstein.
07/13/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 203.(text: CR 7/17/2006 S7633-7650)
06/29/2006 Committee on Appropriations. Reported by Senator Gregg with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 109-273.
06/06/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 389 - 9 (Roll no. 226).
05/22/2006 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 109-476, by Mr. Rogers (KY).