There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to modify bargaining requirements for proposed changes to the personnel management system of the Federal Aviation Administration.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/07/2006Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 271 - 148 (Roll no. 233).(text: CR 6/06/2006 H3394)
05/22/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
06/07/2006-7:07pmOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 271 - 148 (Roll no. 233). (text: CR 6/06/2006 H3394)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/07/2006-6:59pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3479-3480)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2006-9:49pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2006-9:05pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5449.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2006-9:05pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3394-3402)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2006-9:05pmMr. LaTourette moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2006Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Voice Vote.
06/06/2006Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/23/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/22/2006Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/22/2006 Referred to
06/06/2006 Markup by
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation05/23/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5449. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2006)

Amends federal transportation law to repeal, as of April 1, 2006, provisions prohibiting the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) from implementing any proposed change to the FAA personnel management system, in cases where the services of the Federal Mediation and Conciliation Service do not lead to an agreement between the Administrator and FAA employees, until 60 days after the Administrator has transmitted the proposed change (along with the objections of the exclusive bargaining representatives to the change, including the reasons for such objections) to Congress.