Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/23/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/24/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/06/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/06/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/08/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/22/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/19/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/24/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/25/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/25/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/28/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/06/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/07/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/29/2006