Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/22/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/28/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/28/2006