Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 05/23/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/09/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/20/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/20/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/28/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/28/2006