Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/07/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/07/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/07/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/07/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/07/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/07/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/07/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/07/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/07/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/07/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/07/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/13/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/13/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/14/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/22/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/28/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 06/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/13/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/13/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/13/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/13/2006
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/13/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/13/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/13/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/06/2006