Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/24/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/06/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/15/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/10/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/10/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/10/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/17/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/17/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/18/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/18/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/24/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/25/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/25/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/26/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/26/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/28/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/13/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/13/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/15/2006